US HB2549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AI/AN CAPTA American Indian and Alaska Native Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AI/AN CAPTA American Indian and Alaska Native Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1329 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB2480 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback