US HB2501 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the National Telecommunications and Information Administration and the Federal Communications Commission to update the memorandum of understanding on spectrum coordination.
Title
Spectrum Coordination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 418 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 6 (Roll no. 111). (text: 4/4/2022 CR H4134-4135) |
2022-04-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4180-4181) |
2022-04-04 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2501. |
2022-04-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4134-4136) |
2022-04-04 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-287. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-03 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-11-03 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |