US HB248 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to expand eligibility for the surface transportation block grant program, and for other purposes.
Title
Farm-to-Market Road Repair Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E25-26) |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr248/BILLS-117hr248ih.pdf |