US HB2473 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 275 Penn Avenue in Salem, Ohio, as the "Howard Arthur Tibbs Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 275 Penn Avenue in Salem, Ohio, as the "Howard Arthur Tibbs Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-270. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8486) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2473. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8486-8487) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |