US HB2473 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes assistance for water management and infrastructure projects and contains other related provisions. The bill establishes the Water Infrastructure and Drought Solutions Fund within the Department of the Treasury to fund various water-related projects. In addition, the Department of the Interior must establish a pilot program to provide financial assistance to projects in western states that would contribute to a safe and adequate water supply. The Bureau of Reclamation must award prizes for achievements relating to certain uses of water technology. The bill also reauthorizes through FY2026 the Rural Water Supply Program.
Title
Securing Access for the central Valley and Enhancing (SAVE) Water Resources Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1162 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 551.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Arizona
California
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Fishes
Government trust funds
Hawaii
Idaho
Infrastructure development
Kansas
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
North Dakota
Oklahoma
Oregon
Rural conditions and development
South Dakota
Texas
Utah
Washington State
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Arizona
California
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Fishes
Government trust funds
Hawaii
Idaho
Infrastructure development
Kansas
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
North Dakota
Oklahoma
Oregon
Rural conditions and development
South Dakota
Texas
Utah
Washington State
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wyoming
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2473/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2473/BILLS-116hr2473ih.pdf |