US HB2468 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that materials used in carrying out federal infrastructure aid programs are made in the United States. The term produced in the United States means, in the case of iron or steel products, that all manufacturing processes for the iron or steel product, from the initial melting stage through the application of coatings, occurred in the United States; manufactured products, that the product was manufactured in the United States and that the cost of the components of the manufactured product that are mined, produced, or manufactured in the United States is greater than 50% of the total cost of all components of the manufactured product; and construction materials, that all manufacturing processes for the construction material occurred in the United States. The Department of Commerce must (1) issue uniform standards that define the term all manufacturing processes for purposes of this bill, and (2) take into consideration and seek to maximize the jobs benefited or created in the production of the construction material. The bill requires that all steel, iron, manufactured products, non-ferrous metals, plastic, concrete and aggregates, glass (including optical glass), lumber, and drywall used in these programs be produced in the United States. Includes within infrastructure addressed by this bill federal-aid highways, railroads, public transportation, civil aviation, drinking water, and stormwater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Made in America Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2021-06-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2021-06-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2021-06-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E375)
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1094 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects

Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Aviation and airports
Building construction
Buy American requirements
Economic development
Educational technology and distance education
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Internet, web applications, social media
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Medical research
Metals
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Public transit
Railroads
Research administration and funding
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Watersheds

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback