US HB2446 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2013 - Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010, title X of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, to replace the position of Director of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) with a five-member Commission composed of the Vice Chairman for Supervision of the Federal Reserve System and four additional members appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, each to serve for a term of five years. Prohibits the Chair of the Commission from making requests for estimates related to appropriations without the Commission's prior approval. Makes technical and conforming amendments to related statutes.
Title
Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255. |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 113-345. |
2013-11-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 21. |
2013-11-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
SB205 (Related) 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
HB3193 (Related) 2014-03-04 - Received in the Senate.
SB2213 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB205 (Related) 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
HB3193 (Related) 2014-03-04 - Received in the Senate.
SB2213 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments