US SB205 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2013 - Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 (title X of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act) to replace the position of Director of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) with a five-member Commission whose members are appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate. Prohibits the Chair of the Commission from making requests for estimates related to appropriations without the prior approval of the Commission. Revises procedures for funding the CFPB. Eliminates the Consumer Financial Protection Fund and the requirement that the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System transfer funds to the CFPB from the combined earnings of the Federal Reserve System. Authorizes appropriations for FY2013-FY2014. Directs the CFPB, in prescribing a rule under the federal consumer financial laws, to consider the rule's impact on the financial safety or soundness of an insured depository institution.
Title
Responsible Consumer Financial Protection Regulations Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080) |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
HB2402 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
HB2446 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB3192 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
SB2213 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2402 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
HB2446 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB3192 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
SB2213 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s205/BILLS-113s205is.pdf |