US HB2433 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to take actions necessary to ensure that certain individuals may update the burn pit registry with a registered individual’s cause of death, and for other purposes.
Title
Burn Pit Registry Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6280) |
2021-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2433. |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6280-6281) |
2021-11-16 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3967 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.