US HB2424 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior to issue new resource management plans applicable to the Beaver Dam Wash National Conservation Area and the Red Cliffs National Conservation Area and a new amendment to the St. George Field Office Resource Management Plan, and for other purposes. This bill prohibits the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) from implementing or enforcing: (1) the resource management plans for the Beaver Dam Wash National Conservation Area or the Red Cliffs National Conservation Area in Utah; or (2) the amendment to the St. George Field Office Resource Management Plan described in the notice of the BLM titled "Notice of Availability of the Record of Decision and Approved Resource Management Plans for the Beaver Dam Wash and Red Cliffs National Conservation Areas; and Approved Amendment to the St. George Field Office Resource Management Plan in Washington, County, Utah" (published in the Federal Register on December 21, 2016). In their place the BLM shall issue new resource management plans and a new amendment that are prepared: (1) in accordance with the requirements for comprehensive plans for the long-term management of such conservation areas under the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009, and (2) in coordination with affected local governments in accordance with certain criteria for the development and revision of land use plans under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976.
Title
To require the Secretary of the Interior to issue new resource management plans applicable to the Beaver Dam Wash National Conservation Area and the Red Cliffs National Conservation Area and a new amendment to the St. George Field Office Resource Management Plan, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1053 (Same As) 2017-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2424/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2424/BILLS-115hr2424ih.pdf |