US HB23 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require congressional notification for certain changes in status of inspectors general, and for other purposes.
Title
Inspector General Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-01-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-01-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H66-67) |
2021-01-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 23. |
2021-01-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H66-68) |
2021-01-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2662 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.