US HB224 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 5302 Galveston Road in Houston, Texas, as the "Vanessa Guillen Post Office Building."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 5302 Galveston Road in Houston, Texas, as the "Vanessa Guillén Post Office Building". To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 5302 Galveston Road in Houston, Texas, as the Vanessa Guillén Post Office Building.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 408 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2022-05-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-05-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0, 1 Present (Roll no. 164). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4783-4784)
2022-05-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4841-4842)
2022-05-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-05-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 224.
2022-05-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4783-4784)
2022-05-10HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2022-02-02HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2022-02-02HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-01-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2021-01-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback