US HB2026 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-15)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Silviculture Regulatory Consistency Act of 2013 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from requiring, or from promulgating regulations that direct a state to require, a permit under the national pollutant discharge elimination system for a discharge of stormwater runoff resulting from the conduct of the following silviculture activities: nursery operations, site preparation, reforestation, thinning, prescribed burning, pest and fire control, harvesting operations, surface drainage, and road use, construction, and maintenance. Specifies that nothing in this Act exempts a silvicultural activity resulting in the discharge of dredged of fill material from permit requirements for discharges into navigable waters.
Title
Silviculture Regulatory Consistency Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-607. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3573)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Forests, forestry, trees
Licensing and registrations
Water quality
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Forests, forestry, trees
Licensing and registrations
Water quality