US HB202 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers responsibility for investigating certain allegations of misconduct from the Department of Justice (DOJ) Office of Professional Responsibility to the DOJ Office of the Inspector General. Specifically, the bill transfers responsibility for allegations relating to a DOJ attorney's authority to investigate, litigate, or provide legal advice.
Title
Inspector General Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H563) |
2019-01-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 202. |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H563-566) |
2019-01-15 | House | Mr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Subjects
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations