US SB685 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers responsibility for investigating certain allegations of misconduct from the Department of Justice (DOJ) Office of Professional Responsibility to the DOJ Office of the Inspector General. Specifically, the bill transfers responsibility for allegations relating to a DOJ attorney's authority to investigate, litigate, or provide legal advice.
Title
Inspector General Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 487. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB202 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations