US HB1948 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Access to Child Care Act Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide child care assistance to an eligible veteran for any period that the veteran: (1) receives covered health care services at a VA facility, and (2) is required to travel to and return from such facility for the receipt of such services. Defines: (1) "covered health care services" to mean regular mental health care services, intensive mental health care services, or such other intensive health care services to which the VA determines that provision of child care assistance would improve the veteran's access; and (2) "eligible veteran" as a veteran who is the primary caretaker of a child and who is receiving covered health care services from the VA or who is in need of, and who would receive, such services from the VA but for lack of child care. Includes among child care assistance to be provided under this Act: a stipend for the payment of the full cost of child care offered by a licensed child care center, which shall be modeled after the VA's Child Care Subsidy Program; direct provision of child care at an on-site VA facility; a payment made directly to a private child care agency; and collaboration with a facility or program of another federal department or agency.
Title
Veterans' Access to Child Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1496 (Related) 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB469 (Related) 2015-06-24 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3365 (Related) 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB469 (Related) 2015-06-24 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3365 (Related) 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1948/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1948/BILLS-114hr1948ih.pdf |