US HB1936 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Comptroller General to evaluate and issue a report on the structural and economic impacts of climate resiliency at the Federal Emergency Management Agency, including recommendations on how to improve the building codes and standards that the Agency uses to prepare for climate change and address resiliency in housing, public buildings, and infrastructure such as roads and bridges.
Title
Climate Resilient Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation. |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1936/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1936/BILLS-117hr1936ih.pdf |