US HB1906 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Highways and Infrastructure Preservation Act of 2013 - Prohibits a state from prescribing or enforcing any regulation that allows a restricted property-carrying unit (any trailer, semi-trailer, container, or other property-carrying unit longer than 53 feet, except for a fire-fighting unit) to operate on the National Highway System (NHS) (including the Interstate System), unless the operation of such unit is authorized by the state on June 1, 2008, and in actual and lawful operation on a regular or periodic basis (including seasonal operations) on or before that date. Prohibits a state from allowing the operation of a commercial motor vehicle combination on the NHS (except a vehicle or load that cannot be dismantled or divided easily, and that has been issued a special permit under state law) with more than one property-carrying unit (excluding the truck tractor) whose property-carrying units are more than: (1) the maximum combination trailer, semi-trailer, or other type of length limitation allowed by state law on June 1, 2008; or (2) the length of the property-carrying units of those commercial motor vehicle combinations, by specific configuration, in actual and lawful operation on a regular or periodic basis (including continual seasonal operation) in such state on or before June 1, 2008. Prohibits a state from allowing the operation of a vehicle or combination (other than a longer combination vehicle) exceeding Interstate weight limits on the Interstate System unless its operation was lawful: (1) on July 1, 1956; (2) in the case of the overall gross weight of any group of two or more consecutive axles, on January 4, 1975; or (3) under a special permit pursuant to state (grandfather) law. Declares that Interstate weight limitations on vehicles and combinations (other than longer combination vehicles) that operate on the Interstate System shall apply to such vehicles and combinations that operate on non-Interstate segments of the NHS, unless: (1) such segments are subject to lower state weight limits; or (2) a state allows the operation of any vehicle or combination on an existing non-Interstate segment of the NHS that could have been lawfully operated on June 1, 2008.
Title
Safe Highways and Infrastructure Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB880 (Same As) 2013-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Transportation
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Department of Transportation
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1906/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1906/BILLS-113hr1906ih.pdf |