US HB1901 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium in Sitka, Alaska, all U.S. interest in certain property containing 19.07 acres in Sitka for use in connection with health and social services programs. The Consortium shall not be liable for any environmental contamination of the property before such conveyance.
Title
Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Same As) 2018-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-326.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1901/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1901/BILLS-115hr1901ih.pdf |