US HB19 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 134-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for certain reforms with respect to the Medicare program under title XVIII of the Social Security Act, the Medicaid program under title XIX of such Act, the Food and Drug Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Lower Costs, More Cures Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB164 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-8.
SB898 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1857 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1873 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3682 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB164 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-8.
SB898 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1857 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1873 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3682 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/19/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr19/BILLS-117hr19ih.pdf |