US SB164 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-8. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to advance education and awareness among health care providers about biological products as appropriate, including by developing or improving continuing education programs that address the prescribing of biological products and biosimilars. (A biosimilar is a biological product that is highly similar to an FDA-approved reference biological product and has no clinically meaningful differences from that reference product.)The FDA may also maintain and operate a website to provide educational materials about biological products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing Education on Biosimilars Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 412 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-8. (TXT | PDF)
2021-04-23SenateSigned by President.
2021-04-20SenatePresented to President.
2021-04-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 8 (Roll no. 101). (text: CR H1754)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1783-1784)
2021-04-14HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-04-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 164.
2021-04-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1754-1755)
2021-04-14HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-03-08HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-03-08HouseReceived in the House.
2021-03-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-03-03SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1021)
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1021)
2021-02-02SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB19 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1873 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback