US HB1878 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to establish a health insurance affordability fund, and for other purposes.
Title
State Health Care Premium Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB352 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1878/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1878/BILLS-117hr1878ih.pdf |