US HB1849 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-07 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-07 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of Law Technical Clarification Act of 2017 This bill amends the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act to exclude from the definition of "debt collector" any law firm or licensed attorney: (1) serving, filing, or conveying formal legal pleadings, discovery requests, or other documents pursuant to the applicable rules of civil procedure; or (2) communicating in connection with a legal action to collect a debt on behalf of a client in, or at the direction of, a court of law or in the enforcement of a judgment.
Title
Practice of Law Technical Clarification Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4550 (Related) 2017-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5082 (Related) 2018-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 690.
HB5082 (Related) 2018-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 690.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Consumer credit
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
Consumer credit
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1849/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1849/BILLS-115hr1849ih.pdf |