US HB1693 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the provision of Wi-Fi access on school buses be made eligible for support under the E-Rate program, which allots broadband discounts to schools and libraries.
Title
To require the Federal Communications Commission to make the provision of Wi-Fi access on school buses eligible for E-rate support.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB738 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794; text: CR S1794)
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Internet and video services
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Preschool education
Science, technology, communications
Internet and video services
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Preschool education
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1693/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1693/BILLS-116hr1693ih.pdf |