US SB4131 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Accessible, Affordable Internet for All Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accessible, Affordable Internet for All Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1328 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1693 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB2785 (Related) 2019-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3278 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB6563 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E425)
HB6814 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7205 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB738 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794; text: CR S1794)
SB1046 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
SB2344 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3690 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3701 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback