US HB7302 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make high-speed broadband internet service accessible and affordable to all Americans, and for other purposes.
Title
Accessible, Affordable Internet for All Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB1328 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1693 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB2785 (Related) 2019-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3278 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4127 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4486 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB7205 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB738 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794; text: CR S1794)
SB1046 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 567.
SB1167 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2344 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1328 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1693 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB2785 (Related) 2019-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3278 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4127 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB4486 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB7205 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB738 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1794; text: CR S1794)
SB1046 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 567.
SB1167 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2344 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7302/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7302/BILLS-116hr7302ih.pdf |