US HB1328 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ACCESS BROADBAND Act Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCESS BROADBAND Act Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-05-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3488-3489)
2019-05-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1328.
2019-05-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3488-3490)
2019-05-08HouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1046 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback