US HB1615 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Get Foreign Money Out of U.S. Elections Act This bill amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 (FECA) to ban campaign contributions and expenditures by corporations that are controlled, influenced, or owned by foreign nationals. Foreign nationals and such corporations may not make disbursements to political committees that accept donations or contributions that do not comply with the limitations, prohibitions, and reporting requirements of FECA. Corporate political action committees may make contributions and expenditures only if they comply with limitations on the involvement of foreign nationals and such corporations.
Title
Get Foreign Money Out of U.S. Elections Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1585 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Business ethics
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
U.S. and foreign investments
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1615/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1615/BILLS-115hr1615ih.pdf |