US SB1585 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DISCLOSE Act of 2017 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2017 This bill amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 (FECA) to ban campaign contributions and expenditures by corporations that are controlled, influenced, or owned by foreign nationals. The bill redefines the term "independent expenditure" to include an expenditure that is the functional equivalent of express advocacy because it can be interpreted by a reasonable person only as advocating the election or defeat of a candidate. The bill expands the period during which certain communications are treated as electioneering communications. The bill prescribes disclosure requirements for campaign-related disbursements by corporations, labor organizations, and other entities, including a political committee with an account established for the purpose of accepting donations or contributions that do not comply with the contribution limits or source prohibitions under FECA.
Title
DISCLOSE Act of 2017 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB1615 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2966 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1615 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2966 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Business ethics
Business records
Congressional elections
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Labor-management relations
Political advertising
Political parties and affiliation
Public participation and lobbying
Tax-exempt organizations
U.S. and foreign investments
Business records
Congressional elections
Corporate finance and management
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Labor-management relations
Political advertising
Political parties and affiliation
Public participation and lobbying
Tax-exempt organizations
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1585/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1585/BILLS-115s1585is.pdf |