US HB1595 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 163-20)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SAFE Banking Act of 2019 Secure And Fair Enforcement Banking Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE Banking Act of 2019 Secure And Fair Enforcement Banking Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-03-28HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 15.
2019-03-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback