US HB1433 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses workforce morale at the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The bill expands the duties of the Chief Human Capital Officer to address morale, including through leader development and employee engagement, maintaining a catalogue of available employee development opportunities, and issuing a DHS-wide employee engagement action plan. DHS (1) must establish an employee engagement steering committee, and (2) may establish an annual employee award program. DHS shall report to the congressional homeland security committees regarding the impacts of the lapse in appropriations between December 22, 2018, and January 25, 2019, on (1) DHS human resources operations; (2) DHS's ability to meet hiring benchmarks; and (3) retention, attrition, and morale of DHS personnel.
Title
DHS MORALE Act Department of Homeland Security Morale, Recognition, Learning and Engagement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2927-2928) |
2019-04-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1433. |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (considered: CR H2927-2929) |
2019-04-01 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 12. |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-26. |
2019-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Due process and equal protection
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Due process and equal protection
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations