US HB1301 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 85-41-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amateur Radio Parity Act of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to amend station antenna structure regulations to prohibit a private land use restriction from applying to amateur radio stations if the restriction: precludes communications in an amateur radio service, fails to permit a licensee of amateur radio service to install and maintain an effective outdoor antenna on property under its exclusive use or control, or is not the minimum practicable restriction to accomplish the lawful purposes of a community association seeking to enforce the restriction. Before installing an outdoor antenna, however, an amateur radio licensee must obtain a community association's prior approval. A community association may: (1) prohibit installations on common property not under the exclusive control of the licensee, and (2) establish installation rules for amateur radio antennas and support structures.
Title
Amateur Radio Parity Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-09-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5302-5303) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1301. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5302-5304) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 568. |
2016-09-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-732. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1685 (Same As) 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-400. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal preemption
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal preemption
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication