US HB1228 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for sanctions and aid related to the conflict in Libya. The bill provides statutory authority for an April 19, 2016, executive order imposing property- and visa-blocking sanctions on persons contributing to the violence in Libya. The President must impose property- and visa-blocking sanctions on any foreign person that (1) knowingly supports or engages in a significant transaction with a foreign person knowingly operating in Libya on behalf of Russia in a military capacity, (2) engages in significant actions threatening peace or stability in Libya, (3) misappropriates Libyan state assets or natural resources, or (4) is knowingly responsible for or complicit in serious human rights abuses in Libya. These sanctions shall expire on December 31, 2026. Further, the President is authorized to expand educational and cultural exchange programs with Libya. The bill urges the U.S. Agency for International Development to provide humanitarian assistance to individuals and communities in Libya, including health assistance, food, shelter, and support for an effective COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) response. The Department of State must work to strengthen Libya's democratic governance, including by providing assistance to (1) unify Libya's financial and governing institutions, and (2) ensure free and credible future elections in Libya. The Department of the Treasury must vote and argue for international financial institutions to support an economic recovery in Libya that complements the establishment of democratic institutions and rule of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Libya Stabilization Act Libya Stabilization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 386 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-09-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-09-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 35 (Roll no. 300). (text: CR H5483-5488)
2021-09-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5494-5495)
2021-09-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-09-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1228.
2021-09-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5483-5489)
2021-09-28HouseMs. Wild moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-04-21HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-04-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB379 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Africa
Alliances
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Cultural exchanges and relations
Currency
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Egypt
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
France
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Italy
Libya
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Multilateral development programs
Oil and gas
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Qatar
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
United Arab Emirates
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback