TX SJR86 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for observing year-round standard time or daylight saving time and authorizing the legislature to enact legislation that gives effect to the preferred option.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for observing year-round standard time or daylight saving time and authorizing the legislature to enact legislation that gives effect to the preferred option.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Morgan LaMantia [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR22 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to State Affairs
HJR22 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to State Affairs
HJR22 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to State Affairs