TX SJR3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-31 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring a judge or magistrate to impose the least restrictive conditions of bail that may be necessary and authorizing the denial of bail under some circumstances to a person accused of a violent or sexual offense or of continuous trafficking of persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring a judge or magistrate to impose the least restrictive conditions of bail that may be necessary and authorizing the denial of bail under some circumstances to a person accused of a violent or sexual offense or of continuous trafficking of persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - House - Failed of adoption RV#116 (Y: 87 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amended RV#82 (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#81 (Y: 40 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseRecord vote RV#116
2021-08-30HouseFailed of adoption
2021-08-30HouseAmended 1-Kacal
2021-08-30HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-08-30HousePostponed 8/30/21 4:00 PM
2021-08-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-08-27HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#82
2021-08-27HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-08-27HouseAmended 2-Dominguez
2021-08-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#81
2021-08-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-A. Johnson
2021-08-27HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-08-27HousePostponed 8/27/21 3:00 PM
2021-08-27HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-A. Johnson
2021-08-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-27HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2021-08-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-08-20HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-08-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenatePassed
2021-08-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-08-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-08-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-07SenateRecord vote
2021-08-07SenateRules suspended
2021-08-07SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-08-07SenateRead first time
2021-08-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateFiled
2021-08-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HJR1 (Same As) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
HJR1 (Same As) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
SB6 (Enabled by) 2021-09-17 - See remarks for effective date

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR3
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00003I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00003S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00003E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00003H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SJ00003H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SJ00003H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SJ00003H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SJ00003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00003E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SJ00003H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-07-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-09-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR3&RcdVtNo=81&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR3&RcdVtNo=82&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR3&RcdVtNo=116&Ch=H&Dt=08/30/2021

Bill Comments

feedback