TX SJR26 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain persons under the age of 18 to vote in a primary election.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain persons under the age of 18 to vote in a primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB55 (Enabled by) 2019-02-01 - Referred to State Affairs
HJR37 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Referred to Elections
HJR37 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Primaries
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Elections--Primaries
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR26 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00026I.htm |