TX HJR37 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain persons under the age of 18 to vote in a primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing certain persons under the age of 18 to vote in a primary election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Elections
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-12-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB512 (Enabled by) 2019-02-20 - Referred to Elections
SJR26 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback