TX SCR34 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.
Title
Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR36 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HCR51 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
HCR36 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HCR51 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
HCR36 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Subjects
I AM VANESSA GUILLÉN ACT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress