TX HCR36 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.
Title
Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HCR51 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
SCR34 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SCR34 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SCR34 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SCR34 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
I AM VANESSA GUILLÉN ACT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HCR36 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00036I.htm |