TX HCR51 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the United States Congress to pass the I am Vanessa Guillén Act.

Sponsors

Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Art Fierro [D]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]
Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]
Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]
Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]
Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]
Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Adopted as amended RV#390 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2021-05-03SenateRead first time
2021-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-22HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#390
2021-04-21HouseAdopted as amended
2021-04-21HouseAmended 1-C. Morales
2021-04-21HouseLaid before the House
2021-04-21HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-09HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2021-04-09HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-31HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HCR36 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
SCR34 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback