TX SB944 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public information law.
Title
Relating to the public information law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1982 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1396 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1379 (Y: 57 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1982 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1396 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1379 (Y: 57 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1982 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1396 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 3-P. King |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment tabled 2-Middleton |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1379 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to table fails 1-Moody |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Moody |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Watson |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Employees
State Officers
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Employees
State Officers