TX SB835 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the governing body of the independent organization certified to manage the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to the governing body of the independent organization certified to manage the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2034 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2078 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2630 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Referred to State Affairs
SB761 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
HB2078 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2630 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Referred to State Affairs
SB761 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB835 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00835I.htm |