TX SB811 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to immunity from liability of public and private schools and security personnel employed by those schools for certain actions of security personnel.
Title
Relating to immunity from liability of public and private schools and security personnel employed by those schools for certain actions of security personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3946 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Safety
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Safety