TX SB801 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials adopted by the State Board of Education.
Title
Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials adopted by the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1979 (Y: 78 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1726 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Record vote RV#1675 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1674 (Y: 77 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1979 (Y: 78 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1726 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Record vote RV#1675 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1674 (Y: 77 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks