TX SB786 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health benefits coverage.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health benefits coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2171 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident