TX HB2171 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health benefits coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health benefits coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB786 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback