TX SB715 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to a child's medical records by the child's attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, or amicus attorney.
Title
Relating to access to a child's medical records by the child's attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, or amicus attorney.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Rep. Connie Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-15 | Filed | |
2011-02-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |