TX SB7 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the State Board of Education.
Title
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-15 - House - House recedes from amendments RV#100 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#98 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#88 (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - RV#87 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#86 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-10-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#85 (Y: 62 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#98 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#88 (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - RV#87 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#86 (Y: 64 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-10-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#85 (Y: 62 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Effective immediately | |
2021-10-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-10-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-10-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-15 | Senate | House recedes from amendments-reported |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#100 |
2021-10-15 | House | House recedes from amendments |
2021-10-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-10-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#98 |
2021-10-15 | House | Passed |
2021-10-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#88 |
2021-10-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-10-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#87 |
2021-10-15 | House | Amended 3-Bonnen |
2021-10-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#86 |
2021-10-15 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Anchia |
2021-10-15 | House | Record vote RV#85 |
2021-10-15 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Anchia |
2021-10-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-10-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-10-13 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2021-10-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-10-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-10-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-10-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-10-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-10-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-10-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Redistricting |
2021-10-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-10-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Gutierrez |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-09-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-09-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-09-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-09-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Referred to Redistricting, Special |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Filed |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |