TX SB690 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to remotely conducting court proceedings in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remotely conducting court proceedings in this state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-22SenateFiled
2021-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3611 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB3611 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback