TX HB3611 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to remotely conducting court proceedings in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remotely conducting court proceedings in this state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB690 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Left pending in committee
SB690 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback